judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN THE MATTER OF KITE RANCH, LLC, a Wyoming limited liability company: GALEN DUNMIRE and REBECCA DUNMIRE, husband and wife, as joint tenants v. POWELL FAMILY OF YAKIMA, LLC, a Washington limited liability company, DOUGLAS BRICKMAN, individually, and DOUGLAS BRICKMAN and ANNE BRICKMAN, husband and wife and as joint tenants

Case Heading (S-07-0196)
Case Number:S-07-0196Case Docketed On:08/23/2007
Linked To: S-07-0197
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Albany CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Corporations, Partnerships and Associations (Title 17)
Short Title:IN THE MATTER OF KITE RANCH, LLC, a Wyoming limited liability company: GALEN DUNMIRE and REBECCA DUNMIRE, husband and wife, as joint tenants v. POWELL FAMILY OF YAKIMA, LLC, a Washington limited liability company, DOUGLAS BRICKMAN, individually, and DOUGLAS BRICKMAN and ANNE BRICKMAN, husband and wife and as joint tenants
Full Title:IN THE MATTER OF KITE RANCH, LLC, a Wyoming limited liability company: GALEN DUNMIRE and REBECCA DUNMIRE, husband and wife, as joint tenants, Appellants (Plaintiffs), v. POWELL FAMILY OF YAKIMA, LLC, a Washington limited liability company, DOUGLAS BRICKMAN, individually, and DOUGLAS BRICKMAN and ANNE BRICKMAN, husband and wife and as joint tenants, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantGalen DunmireGreg Weisz
AppellantRebecca DunmireGreg Weisz
AppelleeDouglas BrickmanF. Scott Peasley
Frank D. Peasley
AppelleeAnne BrickmanF. Scott Peasley
Frank D. Peasley
AppelleePowell Family of Yakima, LLC a Washington limited liability companyF. Scott Peasley
Frank D. Peasley

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Corporations/Partnership/Limited Liability Entities, Other
Opinion Number:2008 WY 39
Citation:181 P.3d 920 (Wyo. 2008)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
08/23/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
08/23/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
08/23/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
08/23/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
10/08/2007Motion - Other - to file consolidated brief of appellantsMotionOtherFinal
10/08/2007Order - Granting motion for filing of consolidated briefOrderGrantFinal
10/10/2007Brief - Appellant - Appellants' consolidated brief; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppellantFinal
11/26/2007Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
11/27/2007Motion - Consolidated briefMotionConsolidateFinal
11/27/2007Order - Other granting motion for filing consolidated briefOrderOtherFinal
12/07/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
12/12/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
12/12/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - M. Gregory Weisz for appellants.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
12/19/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcript; Volume III, ExhibitsRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
12/19/2007Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
01/07/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Frank Peasley for appellees.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
01/14/2008Event - Phone Call - received call from counsel for appellee's office indicating that although Frank Peasley did not sign the brief, he will be arguing the case.EventPhone CallFinal
01/16/2008Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Michael (Greg) Weisz for appellants; F. Scott Peasley and Frank Peasley, argument by Frank Peasley for appellees) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
01/16/2008Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
04/08/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
04/25/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/25/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
04/25/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/25/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
04/29/2008Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal