judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

PETER DESILVA, ET AL V. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

Case Information: 10-CV-1069
Short Caption:PETER DESILVA, ET AL V. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIAClassification:Appeals - Civil - Property
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAE5336-05Filed Date:08/24/2010

Opening Event Date:08/24/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/08/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:11/29/2010
Argued/Submitted:02/02/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/18/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantPeter Desilva N
Elaine J. Mittleman YN
AppellantJoseph Rumber N
Elaine J. Mittleman YN
AppelleeDistrict of ColumbiaN
Carl J. SchifferleYY
Todd S. KimNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
08/24/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
08/27/2010APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXPEDITE APPEAL (unopposed)
08/31/2010TMC - District's motion to expediate
09/16/2010 ORDERED that APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXPEDITE IS HEREBY GRANTED and THIS APPEAL shall be placed on the JANUARY 2011 CALENDAR. It is FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLANT SHALL, NO LATER THAN, SEPTEMBER 20, 2010 make the ARRANGEMENTS, including payment, to have the NECESSARY TRANSCRIPT prepared on an EXPEDITED BASIS. It is *****MORE*****
09/16/2010 FURTHER ORDERED THAT: APPELLANT'S BRIEF AND APPENDIX shall be filed NO LATER THAN OCTOBER 29, 2010; APPELLEE'S BRIEF SHALL BE FILED NO LATER THAN NOVEMBER 19, 2010; APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF, if any, shall be filed NO LATER THAN DECEMBER 10, 2010. It is FURTHER ORDERED that since this case will be placed on the calendar of January 2011, any requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of extraordinary circumstances. (FITHNW) (rm)
09/16/2010LETTER TO COUNSEL/PARTY RE FUTURE CALENDARING JANUARY 2011 CALENDAR E. MITTLEMAN T. KIM C. SCHIFFERLE
09/21/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT-NEEDED/RT-ORDERED 10/9/09, 3/8/10, 3/9/10 & 3/10/10) (elp)
10/08/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1 (61-pgs/tape 10/9/09 proc.)
10/08/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#2 (108-pgs/tape 3/8/10 proc)
10/08/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#3 (225-pgs/price 3/9/10 proc.)
10/08/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#4 (64-pgs/price 3/10/10 proc.)W/CD attached
10/08/2010RECORD COMPLETED
10/27/2010APLT MO FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF IN EXCESS OF PAGES
10/27/2010RECEIVED - aplt's brief
10/28/2010TMC - appellant's motion to file (LODGED) brief in excess pages
10/28/2010APPENDIX
11/10/2010 ORDERED that APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE to file their BRIEF IS GRANTED and the Clerk SHALL FILE THE LDOGED BRIEF of appellants. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the brief of APPELLEE REMAINS DURE ON OR BEFORE NOVEMBER 19, 2010 and appellee may file a brief that DOES NOT EXCEED 58 PAGES. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's reply brief, if any shall comply with the page limitations and this court will not entertain a motion for leave to file an excess reply brief. (RDBRNW) (rm)
11/10/2010APPELLANT'S BRIEF
11/12/2010LETTER FROM COUNSEL/PARTY RE FUTURE CALENDARING aplt
11/19/2010APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF no oppo to 11/23/10
11/23/2010RECEIVED - aple's brief
11/23/2010RECEIVED - aple's addendum to brief (elp)
11/29/2010 On consideration of appellee's consent motion for an extension of time to file the brief, and the lodged brief and addendum to brief, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and the lodged brief and the addendum to brief are filed. It is (MORE)
11/29/2010APPELLEE'S BRIEF
11/29/2010MISCELLANEOUS - (ADDENDUM TO BRIEF)
11/29/2010 FURTHER ORDERED that this appeal shall be scheduled for consideration before a merits division as soon as the calendar permits. (JAC) elp
11/29/2010BRIEFS COMPLETED
11/29/2010LETTER FROM COUNSEL/PARTY RE FUTURE CALENDARING aple
12/03/2010CALENDAR NOTICE SENT
12/09/2010APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE REPLY BRIEF no oppo to 12/17/10
12/09/2010It is ORDERED, sua sponte, that this matter is removed from the Regular Calendar of January 27, 2011. The Clerk is directed to schedule this matter on the Regular Calendar as soon as the calendar permits. (ETW)
12/10/2010 On consideration of appellants' consent motion for an enlargement of time to file the reply brief, it is ORDERED that appellants' motion is granted and appellant's reply brief shall be filed on or before December 17, 2010. (JAC) elp
12/16/2010CALENDAR NOTICE SENT
12/17/2010APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE REPLY BRIEF to 12/24/10. no oppo
12/23/2010RECEIVED- aplt's reply brief
01/04/2011ORDER GRANT APLT MOTION FOR LV TO FILE REPLY BRIEF and the lodged reply brief is filed. (JC)
01/04/2011APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF
02/02/2011FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
02/02/2011FiledARGUED before Judges Reid, Fisher, Pryor Elaine J. Mittleman, Esq. for appellant Carl J. Schifferle, Esq. for appellee
02/08/2011CERTIFICATE PER RULE 28 (Appellants)
02/16/2011CERTIFICATE PER RULE 28 aple
02/22/2011CERTIFICATE PER RULE 28 (Appellants 2nd)
02/24/2011AFFIRMED (OPINION) (Reid and Fisher, Associate Judges, and Pryor, Senior Judge.) (ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the judgment on appeal is affirmed.)
03/18/2011MANDATE ISSUED