judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-6084
B-6084
06/17/1976
Application for Writ of Error
BILL P. COGDELL
FORT WORTH NATIONAL BANK, TRUSTEE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/21/1976Writ of Certiorari filedPetitioner
11/15/1976Amended PetitionPetitioner
10/14/1976Motion for RehearingPetitioner
06/29/1976Response to PetitionRespondent
06/17/1976Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/21/1976Writ of Certiorari filed
11/15/1976Amended Petition
10/22/1976Response to Motion filed
10/14/1976Motion for RehearingOverruled
06/29/1976Response to Petition
06/17/1976Application for Writ of Error - Filed
06/17/1976Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Fort Worth National Bank, TrusteeRespondent
Bill P. CogdellPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information