judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-269
A-269
07/20/1944
Application for Writ of Error
G. H. EDDS, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS INDEPENDENT EXECUTOR
W. H. MITCHELL, ADMINISTRATOR OF THE ESTATE OF O. D. RHODE, DECEASED
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/06/1944Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
11/01/1944Brief on the MeritsPetitioner
07/31/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
07/20/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
07/20/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/03/1945Letter Filed
11/06/1944Amicus Curiae Brief received
11/01/1944Brief on the Merits
10/26/1944Letter Filed
10/18/1944Bond
10/04/1944Document received (See Remarks)
07/31/1944Response to Petition
07/20/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
07/20/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
07/20/1944Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
W. H. Mitchell, Administrator of the Estate of O. D. Rhode, deceasedRespondent
United States of AmericaAmicus Curiae
G. H. Edds, individually and as Independent ExecutorPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information