judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JJ INDUSTRIES VS. SILVER SPRINGS AIRPORT

Case Information: 38178
Short Caption:JJ INDUSTRIES VS. SILVER SPRINGS AIRPORTCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Lyon Co. - Third Judicial District - CI14490Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/01/2001 / Manoukian, NoelSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/16/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Glade L. Hall--check no. 530.
07/16/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-12092
08/01/2001Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Noel Manoukian. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
10/17/2001MotionFiled Motion. Emergency Motion for Continuance of Settlement Conference. 01-17540
10/19/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On August 27, 2001, appellant submitted an untimely docketing statement. On this same date, the clerk of this court requested appellant to file a motion for permission to file a late docketing statement. To date, appellant has failed to file the requested motion. In the interest of judicial efficiency, we direct the clerk of this court to file that late docketing statement. We caution appellant that any future violations of the Nevada Rules of Appellate Procedure may result in the imposition of sanctions. 01-17635
10/19/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-14442
10/23/2001Notice/Outgoing Letter. Noel Manoukian.
02/01/2002Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 02-02130
02/11/2002Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. This court shall conduct a preliminary jurisdictional review of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). fn1[On October 17, 2001, appellant filed a motion for a continuance of the settlement conference. A request to continue a settlement conference shuld be directed to the settlement judge, not this court. We deny the motion.] 02-02688
02/15/2002Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 02-03054
06/14/2002BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: 06/13/02. 02-10366
06/14/2002AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 02-10367
07/15/2002MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: August 9, 2002. 02-12132
07/31/2002BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 07/31/02. 02-13151
07/31/2002AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 02-13152
08/20/2002BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: 08/19/02. 02-14204
09/03/2002MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Strike Respondent's Appendix and Motion for Sanctions. 02-15188
09/12/2002MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Extension of Time Within Which to file Respondent's Opposition to Motion to Strike Respondent's Appendix and Motion for Sanctions. 02-15912
09/16/2002Other Other. Filed Withdrawal of Motion to Strike Respondent's Appendix and Motion for Sanctions. 02-16059
09/18/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Because appellant withdraws the motion file September 3, 2002, no action will be taken regarding the motion to strike respondent's appendix and impose sanctions. In light of this withdrawal, we deny respondent's September 12, 2002, motion for an extension of time as moot. 02-16279
10/08/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn2[We deem this appeal suitable for disposition on the briefs, without oral argument.] NNP03Y-RR/CY/DA 02-17322
11/05/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-17384
11/05/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/20/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 5, 2002. 02-17384