judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JOHNNY B. WILLIAMS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CO-1068
Short Caption:JOHNNY B. WILLIAMS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Other Criminal
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-809-10Filed Date:08/25/2010

Opening Event Date:08/25/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/16/2010
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohnny B. Williams YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
08/25/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
09/09/2010 ORDERED that appellant shall, w/n 20 days from the date of this order, SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed for having been UNTIMELY FILED. See DC App. R. 4 (b). (BY: ETW)
09/09/2010TMC - OTSC - (LODGED) ROTSC
10/13/2010RECEIVED Appellant's response to Order to Show Cause.
10/18/2010 ORDERED, SS, that the Clerk shall file the LODGED response. It is ****MORE*****
10/18/2010RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
10/18/2010 FURTHER ORDERED that this APPEAL IS HEREBY DISMISSED for lack of jurisdiction as having been UNTIMELY FILED. (RDBETE) (jl)
10/29/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION of Order of Dismissal.
11/01/2010TMC - motion for reconsideration
11/08/2010ORDER DENY APPELLANT MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION (RDBETE) (jl)
11/16/2010MANDATE ISSUED
04/17/2014FiledArchived
04/17/2014FiledArchived
04/17/2014FiledArchived