Case: 14-15-01087-CV
14-15-01087-CV
12/23/2015
Unknown Civil Case Type.
Kingwood GCG, LP
Kingwood Village Estates Condominiums Council of Owners
No
www.txcourts.gov/14thcoa
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
05/09/2016 | Case stored | | |||||||
05/09/2016 | Mandate issued |
| |||||||
05/05/2016 | Mandate due to be issued | | |||||||
04/11/2016 | Petition for review was not filed | | |||||||
04/11/2016 | Petition for review due in Supreme Court | | |||||||
03/11/2016 | Motion for rehearing was not filed | | |||||||
03/11/2016 | Motion for rehearing due | | |||||||
03/03/2016 | Response due | | |||||||
02/25/2016 | Memorandum opinion issued | DISMISSED |
| ||||||
02/25/2016 | Reporters record due | | |||||||
02/24/2016 | Submitted | | |||||||
02/24/2016 | Case ready to be set | | |||||||
02/17/2016 | No payment arrangements made with trial court clerk for record |
| |||||||
02/17/2016 | Letter filed |
| |||||||
02/10/2016 | Response due | | |||||||
02/05/2016 | Clerks record due | | |||||||
01/26/2016 | Notification received that no record was taken | | |||||||
01/26/2016 | Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record |
| |||||||
01/26/2016 | Order entered |
| |||||||
01/26/2016 | Order entered |
| |||||||
01/21/2016 | Notice of late record |
| |||||||
01/21/2016 | Response due | | |||||||
01/18/2016 | Reporters record due | | |||||||
01/18/2016 | Record due | | |||||||
01/12/2016 | Docketing statement due | | |||||||
01/12/2016 | Mediation docketing statement due | | |||||||
01/11/2016 | Past due court fee notice |
| |||||||
01/07/2016 | Court fee due | | |||||||
12/28/2015 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||||||
12/28/2015 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||||||
12/23/2015 | Case began in court of appeals |
| |||||||
12/21/2015 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||||
11/19/2015 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
05/09/2016 | Case Stored | Case stored |
05/09/2022 | Retention | Date civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Kingwood Village Estates Condominiums Council of Owners | Appellee | Cade White |
Kingwood GCG, LP | Appellant | Wyatt Maxwell Tanya Deniese Henderson |
Trial Court Information
125th District Court
Harris
Honorable Judge, 125th District Court
2015-06950
Court Reporter, 125th District Court