judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-8527
A-8527
07/12/1961
Application for Writ of Error
INA MAY MCADAMS, ET VIR
LONDA PICKETT OGLETREE, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/02/1961Motion for RehearingPetitioner
09/29/1961Reply to ResponseRespondent
09/27/1961Reply to ResponsePetitioner
07/31/1961Response to PetitionRespondent
07/12/1961Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/06/1961Response to Motion filed
11/02/1961Motion for RehearingOverruled
09/29/1961Reply to Response
09/27/1961Reply to Response
07/31/1961Response to Petition
07/12/1961Application for Writ of Error - Filed
07/12/1961Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Ina May McAdams, et virPetitioner
Londa Pickett Ogletree, et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information