Case: 05-18-00300-CV
05-18-00300-CV
03/20/2018
Miscellaneous/other civil
Shemeka L. Bradley
Breckinridge Point
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
07/06/2018 | Mandate issued |
| |||||||
06/13/2018 | Sent to publisher | | |||||||
04/25/2018 | Memorandum opinion issued | Dismissed |
| ||||||
04/25/2018 | Retention time case file will be retained | Destroy | | ||||||
04/24/2018 | Submitted | | |||||||
04/04/2018 | No reporters record filed in civil case |
| |||||||
04/01/2018 | Record due | | |||||||
03/28/2018 | No payment arrangements made with trial court clerk for record |
| |||||||
03/27/2018 | Letter filed | | |||||||
03/21/2018 | Fee requested |
| |||||||
03/21/2018 | Docketing statement due |
| |||||||
03/20/2018 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
| |||||||
02/06/2018 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||||
01/31/2018 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
04/25/2024 | Retention | Date civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate) |
07/06/2018 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Bradley, Shemeka L. | Appellant | Shemeka L. Bradley |
Breckinridge Point | Appellee | Matthew Walton |
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No. 3
Collin
Honorable Lance S. Baxter
003-00127-2018
Claudia Webb