judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-6173
B-6173
06/27/1976
Application for Writ of Error
LEE BROTHERTON, DBA SHIELD PATROL AGENCY
HOWARD MWIKUTA, CULLUM COMPANIES, INC., AND TOM THUMB FOOD STORES, INC.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/22/1976Motion for RehearingPetitioner
08/16/1976Brief on the MeritsRespondent
08/11/1976Response to PetitionRespondent
07/27/1976Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/07/1976Letter Filed
12/07/1976Letter Filed
10/29/1976Response to Motion filed
10/28/1976Response to Motion filed
10/22/1976Motion for RehearingOverruled
08/16/1976Brief on the Merits
08/11/1976Response to Petition
07/27/1976Application for Writ of Error - Filed
06/27/1976Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Howard MwikutaRespondent
Cullum Companies, Inc., and Tom Thumb Food Stores, Inc.Respondent
Lee Brotherton, dba Shield Patrol AgencyPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information