Case: 14-0998
14-0998
12/02/2014
Petition for Review under Tex. R. App. P. 53.1
OSIELA G. VILLARREAL, INDIVIDUALLY, AND AS REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF JOSE RODRIGUEZ, DECEASED AND AS NEXT FRIEND OF HER MINOR CHILDREN, AND MARISELA TREVINO RODRIGUEZ
TROY CONSTRUCTION, LLC
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
12/18/2014 | Response to Petition | Respondent | Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Respondent Troy Construction, LLC. | |||||
12/02/2014 | Petition for Review | Petitioner | Petition for Review filed on behalf of Osiela G. Villarreal. |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
03/06/2015 | Notice sent to Court of Appeals | |
| |||||
01/23/2015 | Petition for Review disposed | Denied | |
| ||||
12/23/2014 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |||||
12/19/2014 | Electronic communication sent to Party | E-mailed Mr. Courtney regarding the missing Certificate of Compliance to the Response Filed. | | |||||
12/18/2014 | Response to Petition | Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Respondent Troy Construction, LLC. | ||||||
12/02/2014 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposed | Filing granted | Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review is Granted; Petition was filed on December 2, 2014. |
| ||||
12/02/2014 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed | Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Osiela G. Villarreal. |
| |||||
12/02/2014 | Phone call from Clerk's Office | Spoke with Mr. Melton's legal assistant about filing an extension for the petition, and discussed corrections needed for resubmission. | | |||||
12/02/2014 | Petition for Review | Petition for Review filed on behalf of Osiela G. Villarreal. |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
03/06/2015 | Case Stored | Case stored. | e-stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Rodriguez, Marisela Trevino | Intervenor | Mr. Jeffrey Ragan Seely Mr. John Foster Melton |
Villareal , Osilea G. | Petitioner | Mr. Peter Ferraro Mr. Eustorgio Perez Mr. John Foster Melton |
Troy Construction, LLC | Respondent | Mr. Benjamin Rosenbach Mr. Jobe Jackson Mr. Geoffrey Neil Courtney |
Court of Appeals Information:
04-13-00832-CV
Affirmed
___ SW3d ___, 10-15-14
4th Court of Appeals
Honorable Rebeca C. Martinez
Trial Court Information
111th District Court
Webb
Honorable Monica Z. Notzon
2010-CVT-001888-D2