Case: D-3090
D-3090
11/10/1992
App Writ of Error
M. N. DANNENBAUM INC.
CHARLES H. BRUMMERHOP CHARLES H. BRUMMERHOP & ASSOCIATES AND CHARLES H. BRUMMERHOP INC.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/06/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
11/24/1992 | Reply to Response | Respondent | | |
11/10/1992 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/06/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
04/30/1993 | Record returned to Court of Appeals | No rehearing filed | | |
03/24/1993 | Application for Writ of Error - Disposed | Denied | | |
11/25/1992 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |
11/24/1992 | Reply to Response | | | |
11/10/1992 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
04/30/1993 | Case Stored | Case stored. | No rehearing filed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
M.N. DANNENBAUM, INC. | Petitioner | Mr. John C. Allen Ms. Christy A. Hext |
BRUMMERHOP, CHARLES H. | Respondent | Mr. Andrew F. Spalding |
CHARLES H. BRUMMERHOP, INC. | Respondent | Ms. Ileana M. Blanco |
CHARLES H. BRUMMERHOP & ASSOC. | Respondent | Ms. Ileana M. Blanco |
Court of Appeals Information:
Affirmed [duplicate 3]
840 SW2d 624, 09-03-92
14th Court of Appeals
Honorable JOE L. DRAUGHN
Trial Court Information
280th District Court
Harris
Honorable Tony Lindsay
89-44026