judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

STEPHEN R. GRAY V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-1057
Short Caption:STEPHEN R. GRAY V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF1-22959-07Filed Date:08/24/2010

Opening Event Date:08/24/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:08/30/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:Y
Briefs Completed:04/23/2012
Argued/Submitted:01/24/2013
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/15/2014

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Amanda J. Winchester YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
08/24/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
09/21/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Peter H. Meyers, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
09/21/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Peter H. Meyers, Esquire
09/30/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT orderd/needed (pii)
12/29/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (43 pgs/tape) 12/18/07 proc.
12/29/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (10 pgs/Coney) 4/29/08 proc.
12/29/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (176 pgs/Richer) 7/21/08 proc.
12/29/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (89 pgs/tape) 2/20/09 proc.
12/29/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (41 pgs/Van Bremen) 1/8/10 proc.
12/29/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (45 pgs/Davis) 3/23/10 proc.
12/29/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #7 (82 pgs/Gilliam) 3/29/10 proc.
12/29/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #8 (182 pgs/Gilliam) 3/30/10 proc.
12/29/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #9 (112 pgs/Gilliam) 4/2/10 proc.
12/29/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #10 (109 pgs/Gilliam) 4/5/10 proc.
12/29/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #11 (241 pgs/Gilliam) 4/6/10 proc.
12/29/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #12 (24 pgs/Ott) 4/12/10 proc.
12/29/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #13 (147 pgs/McCarn) 4/13/10 proc.
12/29/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #14 (203 pgs/Gilliam) 4/14/10 proc.
12/29/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #15 (204-413 pgs/Richer) 4/15/10 proc.
12/29/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #16 (414-627 pgs/McCarn) 4/19/10 proc.
12/29/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #17 (628-885 pgs/Ott) 4/20/10 proc.
12/29/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #18 (886-1119 pgs/Allison) 4/21/10 proc.
12/29/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #19 (1120-1290 pgs/ Armstrong) 4/22/10 proc.
12/29/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #20 (1291-1533 pgs/Burr) 4/26/10 proc.
12/29/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #21 (1529-1778 pgs/Davis) 4/27/10 proc.
12/29/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #22 (1779-2052 pgs/Hunt) 4/28/10 proc.
12/29/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #23 (2053-2166 pgs/Walker) 4/29/10 proc.
12/29/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #24 (2167-2350 pgs/Wood) 5/3/10 proc.
12/29/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #25 (2351-2547 pgs/Gilliam) 5/4/10 proc.
12/29/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #26 (2548-2644 pgs/Richer) 5/5/10 proc.
12/29/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #27 (13 pgs/Hunt) 5/10/10 proc.
12/29/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #28 (11 pgs/Richer) 6/24/10 proc.
12/29/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #29 (11 pgs/Davis) 7/16/10 proc.
12/29/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #30 (28 pgs/McCarn) 8/16/10 proc. w/cd
12/29/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #31 (SEALED pleadings)
12/29/2010RECORD INDEX
12/29/2010RECORD COPIES
01/13/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
02/22/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 60 days. no oppo
02/25/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before May 2, 2011. (JAC)
04/18/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF no oppo until completion of transcripts
07/14/2011FiledOn consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, wherein appellant indicate(s) that transcript is being prepared, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and the brief of appellant shall be filed within 40 days from the date the transcript is filed with this court. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant shall advise this court within 15 days thereof of appellant's receipt of the ordered transcript. (pii)
08/30/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #32 (41 pgs/McCarn) 4/13/10 proc
08/30/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #33 (16 pgs/Walker) 4/29/10 proc.
08/30/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #34 (10 pgs/Wood) 5/3/10 proc. w/cd
08/30/2011FiledRECORD COMPLETED
09/23/2011FiledBriefing Order
11/01/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
11/01/2011FiledAppendix (Appellant)
12/06/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
12/19/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief to 2/6/12.
01/31/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellee)Granted
02/02/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief to 3/7/12.
03/07/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
03/29/2012FiledCounsel's Motion To Withdraw (Appellant)Denied
04/20/2012FiledTMC//COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW
04/23/2012FiledORDER DENYING COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW and GRANTING APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME and the CLERK SHALL FILE THE APPELLEE'S LODGED BRIEF
04/23/2012FiledBrief (Appellee)
04/23/2012FiledBriefing Completed
06/14/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Regular
07/02/2012FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
07/12/2012FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellee)
10/09/2012FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellant)
12/03/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
01/24/2013FiledArgued before Judges Glickman, Oberly, Belson
10/04/2013FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Glickman and Oberly, Associates, and Belson, Senior Judge.)
10/11/2013FiledPetition For Rehearing/Rehearing En Banc (Appellant)
05/06/2014FiledOrder Denying appellant's petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc.
05/15/2014FiledMandate
11/06/2014FiledNotice Of Denial Of Pet. For Writ Of Certiorari (Appellant)
11/24/2014FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)