judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MICHAEL J. DEE v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-07-0185)
Case Number:S-07-0185Case Docketed On:08/14/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Public Health and Safety (Title 35)
Short Title:MICHAEL J. DEE v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:MICHAEL J. DEE, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantMichael J. Dee Pro Se
AppelleeThe State of WyomingTerry L. Armitage
Bruce A. Salzburg

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Constitutional Law - Wyoming, Other
Opinion Number:2008 WY 17
Citation:177 P.3d 218

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
08/14/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
08/14/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
08/14/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
08/14/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
09/28/2007Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
10/25/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on disk and designation of record on appealBriefAppelleeFinal
10/29/2007Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
11/09/2007Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
11/13/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
11/13/2007Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
11/21/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, one volume, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
11/21/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
02/13/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Golden writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
02/26/2008Petition - RehearingPetitionRehearingFinal
03/11/2008Order - Petition for rehearing - denyOrderPetition for rehearing - denyFinal
03/11/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
03/11/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
03/11/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
03/17/2008Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 3/14/08 by Vicki Federer.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
06/16/2008Notice-Incoming - U.S. Supreme Court notice of filing writ of certiorariNotice-IncomingU.S. Supreme CourtFinal