judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BERUBE (DAVID) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38167
Short Caption:BERUBE (DAVID) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR011061Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/16/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/16/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) 01-12072
07/27/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: June 28, 2001. Court Reporter: Debbie Vieira. Filed in district court on: July 19, 2001. 01-12741
08/06/2001TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 5/29/01; 6/28/01. Court Reporter: Debbie Vieira. 01-13225
08/27/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 01-14462
08/27/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 01-14463
09/12/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 01-15449
09/28/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP02-CY/DA/ML 01-16423
10/24/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-16554
10/24/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/01/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 29, 2001. 01-16554