judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

FISHER (JAMES) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38166
Short Caption:FISHER (JAMES) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 59645
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C172558Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:08/08/2002How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/16/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/16/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 01-12070
07/18/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-12228
07/30/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 5/4/01. To Court Reporter: Joe D'Amato. 01-12797
07/30/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-12798
08/20/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: May 1, 2001 through May 4, 2001. Court Reporter: Joseph A. D'Amato. 01-14050
11/09/2001MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: December 10, 2001. 01-18801
02/14/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date, appellant has failed to file the opening brief and appendix. Appellant shall, within 15 days of the date of this order, file and serve the opening brief and appendix or show cause why sanctions, including dismissal of this appeal as abandoned, should not be imposed. Respondent shall within 30 days of service of the opening brief, file and serve the answering brief. Appellant may file a reply brief within 30 days of service of the answering brief. 02-02913
04/08/2002MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 02-06128
04/08/2002AppendixReceived Appendix. (Appellant's). 02-06130
04/12/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed April 8, 2002. The clerk shall file the opening brief and appendix received on April 8, 2002. 02-06548
04/12/2002BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Express-no postmark. Signed by Craig F. Jorgenson. 02-06129
04/12/2002AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 02-06130
05/06/2002MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: June 3, 2002. 02-07871
06/05/2002BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark. 02-09783
07/18/2002Case Status Update Briefing Completed. No reply brief filed.
08/08/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision on the briefs filed herein. 02-13597
08/08/2002Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
04/09/2003Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP03-RR/WM/MG 03-05948
05/06/2003RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 03-06270
05/06/2003Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
05/14/2003RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 9, 2003. 03-06270