Case: 02-19-00147-CV
02-19-00147-CV
04/25/2019
Miscellaneous/other civil
Shatara Wright
Michael Stephen Payne
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
08/16/2019 | Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellee |
| ||||
07/26/2019 | Appendix filed | Appellant |
| ||||
07/17/2019 | Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellant |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
02/04/2020 | Mandate issued | Dismissed |
| ||||||
11/14/2019 | Motion to strike disposed | Dismissed | | ||||||
11/14/2019 | Memorandum opinion issued | Dismissed-Want of Jurisdiction |
| ||||||
11/14/2019 | Memorandum opinion issued | Dismissed-Want of Jurisdiction |
| ||||||
11/04/2019 | Electronic Supplemental Reporter/Recorders Record Filed |
| |||||||
10/01/2019 | Submitted | | |||||||
09/24/2019 | Motion to strike filed |
| |||||||
09/23/2019 | Response filed |
| |||||||
09/20/2019 | Objection disposed | Motion or Writ Denied |
| ||||||
09/19/2019 | Objection filed |
| |||||||
09/09/2019 | Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied |
| |||||||
08/16/2019 | Case ready to be set | | |||||||
08/16/2019 | Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested |
| |||||||
08/12/2019 | Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed |
| |||||||
07/26/2019 | Appendix filed |
| |||||||
07/23/2019 | Appearance of counsel |
| |||||||
07/17/2019 | Corrected brief requested |
| |||||||
07/17/2019 | Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested |
| |||||||
06/17/2019 | Electronic Clerks Record Filed |
| |||||||
06/06/2019 | Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed |
| |||||||
06/06/2019 | Clerks notice to court regarding status of record |
| |||||||
05/21/2019 | Docketing statement filed | | |||||||
05/21/2019 | Fee paid |
| |||||||
05/20/2019 | Notice of late filing fee |
| |||||||
05/17/2019 | Docketing statement filed | | |||||||
05/15/2019 | Appearance of counsel |
| |||||||
05/07/2019 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||||||
05/02/2019 | Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court | | |||||||
05/01/2019 | Appellant notified that notice of appeal late/show grounds to continue |
| |||||||
04/25/2019 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
02/04/2020 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Payne, Michael Stpehen | Appellee | Paul M. Leopold Sean Patrick Abeyta |
Wright, Shatara | Appellant | Mary D. McKnight |
Trial Court Information
462nd District Court
Denton
Honorable Brody Young Shanklin
16-02115-211
Court Reporter, 211th District Court, Denton County