judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-5290
B-5290
05/08/1975
Application for Writ of Error
BARBARA POPE, ET VIR
HARRIS HOSPITAL
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/22/1975Errata FiledPetitioner
07/22/1975Motion for RehearingPetitioner
06/09/1975Reply to ResponsePetitioner
05/20/1975Response to PetitionRespondent
05/08/1975Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
08/01/1975Response to Motion filed
07/22/1975Errata Filed
07/22/1975Motion for RehearingOverruled
06/09/1975Reply to Response
05/20/1975Response to Petition
05/08/1975Application for Writ of Error - Filed
05/08/1975Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Harris HospitalRespondent
Barbara Pope, et virPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information