judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-5240
B-5240
04/22/1975
Application for Writ of Error
JOYCE N. DANNAR, WALTER W. DANNAR, JR., JOE M. HINKLE, BESSIE HINKLE AND LELIA MOORE
EMPLOYERS CASUALTY COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/25/1975Motion for RehearingPetitioner
05/07/1975Response to PetitionRespondent
04/22/1975Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/02/1975Response to Motion filed
06/25/1975Motion for RehearingOverruled
05/16/1975Response to Motion filed
05/07/1975Response to Petition
05/06/1975Motion to dismissOverruled
04/22/1975Application for Writ of Error - Filed
04/22/1975Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
EMPLOYERS CASUALTY COMPANYRespondent
Joyce N. Dannar, Walter W. Dannar, Jr., Joe M. Hinkle, Bessie Hinkle and Lelia MoorePetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information