judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-5233
B-5233
04/17/1975
Application for Writ of Error
PEARLINE KATHY ARMENDARIZ, MICHA MIRACLE, AND B AND B VENDING AND MUSIC COMPANY, DBA B AND B VENDING COMPANY
JOE B. MORA DBA CENTRAL VENDING COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/24/1975Response to Brief filedPetitioner
07/10/1975Motion for RehearingPetitioner
05/21/1975Reply to ResponsePetitioner
05/01/1975Response to PetitionRespondent
04/17/1975Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/30/1975Opinion issued
07/30/1975Document received (See Remarks)
07/24/1975Response to Brief filed
07/14/1975Response to Motion filed
07/10/1975Motion for RehearingFiling granted
05/21/1975Reply to Response
05/01/1975Response to Petition
04/17/1975Application for Writ of Error - Filed
04/17/1975Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Joe B. Mora dba Central Vending CompanyRespondent
Pearline Kathy Armendariz, Micha Miracle, and B and B Vending and Music Company, dba B and B Vending CompanyPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information