judyrecords
search tips
750 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Antone Richie v. The State of Texas

Case: 14-12-01027-CR
14-12-01027-CR
11/12/2012
Murder
Antone Richie
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event Type Description Document
07/26/2013Brief filed - oral argument requestedState
04/26/2013Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
Date Event Type Disposition Document
11/22/2017Letter filed
12/05/2016Letter filed
01/08/2015Letter filed
11/03/2014Letter filed
09/26/2014Case stored
09/26/2014Mandate issued
09/23/2014Motion to stay issuance of mandate disposedDENIED
09/16/2014Mandate due to be issued
09/16/2014Motion to stay issuance of mandate filed
08/20/2014Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsREFUSED
07/23/2014Petition for discretionary review due
07/14/2014Case forwarded to higher court
07/11/2014Petition for discretionary review filed
06/23/2014Petition for discretionary review due
06/20/2014Motion for extension of time to file petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsGRANTED
06/06/2014Motion for rehearing was not filed
06/06/2014Motion for rehearing due
05/22/2014Memorandum opinion issuedAFFIRMED
01/07/2014Submitted
11/25/2013Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied
07/26/2013Brief filed - oral argument requested
07/26/2013Case ready to be set
07/26/2013State brief due
07/23/2013Letter issued by the court
07/15/2013Letter filed
06/27/2013Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGRANTED
06/26/2013Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
06/26/2013State brief due
05/30/2013Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGRANTED
05/29/2013Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
05/28/2013State brief due
04/30/2013Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGRANTED
04/29/2013Appellants brief due
04/26/2013Brief filed - oral argument requested
04/26/2013Motion filed
04/03/2013Letter filed
03/28/2013Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGRANTED
03/28/2013Appellants brief due
03/27/2013Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
02/28/2013Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGRANTED
02/28/2013Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
02/28/2013Appellants brief due
01/29/2013Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGRANTED
01/28/2013Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
01/28/2013Appellants brief due
01/04/2013Clerks record due
01/04/2013Reporters record due
01/04/2013Record due
12/27/2012Clerks record filed
12/11/2012Reporters record filed
12/06/2012Exhibits filed
12/06/2012Reporters record filed
12/03/2012Reporters record filed
11/13/2012Court reporters information sheet sent
11/13/2012Trial court clerks certification of record requested
11/12/2012Case began in court of appeals
11/06/2012Notice of appeal filed in trial court
11/05/2012Sentence imposed in the trial court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/26/2014Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State Bar of TexasCriminal - State of TexasMelissa H Stryker  
Richie, Antone Criminal - AppellantAntone Richie
Jani J. Maselli Wood
Trial Court Information
230th District Court
Harris
Honorable Judge, 230th District Court
1300545
Gina Bench
30 Yrs. TDCJ