judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-5236
B-5236
04/22/1975
Application for Writ of Error
SHEARN MOODY, JR., ET AL.
STATE OF TEXAS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/23/1977Motion for RehearingPetitioner
05/13/1975Response to PetitionRespondent
04/22/1975Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/23/1977Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/09/1977Opinion issued
02/17/1977Motion to Recuse filed
01/08/1976Document received (See Remarks)
12/29/1975Document received (See Remarks)
12/17/1975Document received (See Remarks)
05/13/1975Response to Petition
04/22/1975Application for Writ of Error - Filed
04/22/1975Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
State of TexasRespondent
Shearn Moody, Jr., et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information