judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

LLOYD PITTS V. ELWYN SMITH

Case Information: 10-DA-0015
Short Caption:LLOYD PITTS V. ELWYN SMITHClassification:Discretionary - Discretionary - Small Claims
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:SC2-10333-07Filed Date:08/26/2010

Opening Event Date:08/26/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerLloyd Pitts NPro SeN
RespondentElwyn Smith NPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
08/26/2010APPLICATION FOR ALLOWANCE OF APPEAL Denied
08/26/2010FILING FEE of $10.00.
09/02/2010 ORDERED that APPLICANT shall W/N 20 DAYS from the date of this order, SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed for having been UNTIMELY FILED. See DC App. R. 6. (BY: ETW)
09/02/2010TMC - OTSC
11/04/2010ORDER DENYING APPLICATION FOR ALLOWANCE OF APPEAL to the extent the application iis taken from the Feb 6, 2008 dismissal, itis dismissed as untimely.Additionally, the application is dismissed as preamture as to the later order, w/o prejudic to filing a timely new application of allowanceof appeal from the Nov 1,2010 order by Nov. 12, 10. (OBNKST)