judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PRIETO (ALVARO) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38168
Short Caption:PRIETO (ALVARO) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C38450Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:08/27/2001How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/16/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/16/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 01-12074
08/08/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 30 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] 01-13426
08/27/2001Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. 01-14470
08/27/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
09/12/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP02-MS/RR/NB 01-15423
10/09/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-15691
10/09/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/23/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On September 12, 2001, this court affirmed the order of the district court denying appellant's post-conviction petition for a writ of habeas corpus. On September 20, 2001, this court received a proper person document supplementing the habeas corpus petition filed in the district court. fn1[It appears that appellant prepared and mailed his document prior to receiving this court's order of affirmance.] To the extent that appellant requests any relief, this court denies as moot the relief requested. 01-17847
11/02/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 16, 2001. 01-15691