judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-5238
B-5238
04/22/1975
Application for Writ of Error
CLAYTON BROKERAGE CO. OF ST. LOUIS, INC.
ROY W. MOUER, SECURITIES COMMISSIONER OF TEXAS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/31/1975Motion for RehearingRespondent
11/10/1975Response to Brief filedPetitioner
07/21/1975Motion for RehearingPetitioner
07/09/1975Response to Brief filedPetitioner
07/01/1975Supplement to ResponseRespondent
06/23/1975Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
06/17/1975Response to Brief filedRespondent
06/11/1975Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
06/04/1975Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
05/16/1975Response to PetitionRespondent
04/22/1975Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
01/13/1976Response to Motion filed
12/31/1975Motion for RehearingOverruled
12/17/1975Opinion issued
11/10/1975Response to Brief filed
10/28/1975Response to Motion filed
09/29/1975Miscellaneous Motion
07/21/1975Motion for Rehearing
07/09/1975Response to Brief filed
07/01/1975Supplement to Response
06/23/1975Amicus Curiae Brief received
06/17/1975Response to Brief filed
06/11/1975Supplemental Brief filed
06/04/1975Amicus Curiae Brief received
05/16/1975Response to Petition
04/22/1975Application for Writ of Error - Filed
04/22/1975Document received (See Remarks)
04/22/1975Document received (See Remarks)
04/22/1975Document received (See Remarks)
04/22/1975Document received (See Remarks)
04/22/1975Document received (See Remarks)
04/22/1975Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Clayton Brokerage Co. of St. Louis, Inc.Petitioner
Roy W. Mouer, Securities Commissioner of TexasRespondent
Marshall, Bratter, Greene, Allison and TuckerAmicus Curiae
Graham PurcellAmicus Curiae
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information