Case: 04-19-00354-CV
04-19-00354-CV
05/24/2019
Miscellaneous/other civil
Cumberland Surgical Hospital of San Antonio, LLC; PSN Affiliates, LLC- North Loop Series
CCA Financial, LLC
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
10/21/2019 | Reply brief filed | Appellant |
| ||||||
10/01/2019 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | Appellee |
| ||||||
09/11/2019 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | Appellant |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
02/12/2020 | Mandate issued |
| |||||||
12/04/2019 | Memorandum opinion issued | Affirmed |
| ||||||
12/04/2019 | Submitted | | |||||||
10/25/2019 | Order entered |
| |||||||
10/25/2019 | Motion to supplement record disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | | ||||||
10/25/2019 | Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied |
| |||||||
10/23/2019 | Response filed |
| |||||||
10/21/2019 | Reply brief filed |
| |||||||
10/21/2019 | Motion to supplement record filed |
| |||||||
10/01/2019 | Case ready to be set | | |||||||
10/01/2019 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested |
| |||||||
09/11/2019 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested |
| |||||||
08/13/2019 | Order entered |
| |||||||
08/13/2019 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Grant motion | | ||||||
08/12/2019 | Response filed |
| |||||||
08/12/2019 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||||
08/12/2019 | Supplemental clerks record filed |
| |||||||
07/26/2019 | Order entered |
| |||||||
06/20/2019 | Prescreened | | |||||||
06/19/2019 | Appearance of counsel |
| |||||||
06/17/2019 | Clerks record filed |
| |||||||
06/07/2019 | Docketing statement filed |
| |||||||
05/28/2019 | Case began in court of appeals | | |||||||
05/24/2019 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
| |||||||
05/24/2019 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||||
03/27/2019 | Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court | | |||||||
02/25/2019 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
02/12/2020 | Case Stored | Case stored |
02/12/2026 | Retention | Date civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
PSN Affiliates, LLC- North Loop Series | Appellant | Benjamin Leon Stewart Adam Bell Alexander Max Brauer |
Cumberland Surgical Hospital of San Antonio, LLC | Appellant | Alexander Max Brauer Benjamin Leon Stewart Adam Bell |
CCA Financial, LLC | Appellee | Clinton Twaddell III Clinton Buck Patrick H. Autry Zachary B. Aoki |
Trial Court Information
45th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Mary Lou Alvarez
2019CI03676