judyrecords
search tips
750 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Douglas Keith Hall v. The State of Texas

Case: 05-18-00443-CR
05-18-00443-CR
04/18/2018
Securing Execution of Document by Deception
Douglas Keith Hall
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event Type Description Document
12/12/2018Brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
10/29/2018Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
Date Event Type Disposition Document
01/06/2020Mandate issued
12/19/2019Case returned from higher court
11/20/2019Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsRefused
10/21/2019Petition for discretionary review filed
09/06/2019Motion for extension of time to file petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsMotion or Writ Granted
08/22/2019Memorandum opinion issuedAffirmed
08/22/2019Memorandum opinion issuedAffirmed
08/22/2019Retention time case file will be retainedRetain
05/29/2019Submitted
03/07/2019Set for submission on briefs
12/26/2018State brief due
12/12/2018Case ready to be set
12/12/2018Brief filed - oral argument not requested
11/28/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/28/2018State brief due
11/27/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
10/31/2018Appearance of counsel
10/29/2018Brief filed - oral argument not requested
10/29/2018Appellants brief due
09/28/2018Appellants brief due
09/25/2018Order enteredMotion or Writ Granted
09/24/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
08/29/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/29/2018Appellants brief due
08/28/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
07/30/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed
07/26/2018Extension of time to file reporters record filed
07/06/2018Motion to substitute attorney disposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/03/2018Motion to substitute attorney filed
07/02/2018Motion to substitute attorney filed
06/19/2018No reporters record filed in criminal case
06/18/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed
06/15/2018Record due
04/19/2018Docketing statement filed
04/18/2018Docketing statement due
04/18/2018Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
03/14/2018Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court
03/02/2018Trial court certification filed
02/16/2018Notice of appeal filed in trial court
02/15/2018Judgment signed by trial court judge
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/23/2020Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Hall, Douglas KeithCriminal - AppellantRobert Udashen
Brett Ordiway  
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of TexasJohn Creuzot
Marisa Elmore  
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 1
Dallas
Honorable Dallas Criminal District Court Judge, Criminal District Court No. 1
F-1600108-H
Crystal R. Brown
10 years in TDCJ