judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-8592
A-8592
08/15/1961
Application for Writ of Error
GENELL, INC.
RORY FLYNN, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/17/1962Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
07/05/1962Motion for RehearingRespondent
11/15/1961Brief on the MeritsRespondent
09/05/1961Response to PetitionRespondent
08/15/1961Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/17/1962Amicus Curiae Brief received
07/10/1962Response to Motion filed
07/05/1962Motion for RehearingOverruled
07/03/1962Motion to Argue filed
06/20/1962Opinion issued
12/08/1961Letter Filed
12/05/1961Letter Filed
11/30/1961Letter Filed
11/16/1961Letter Filed
11/15/1961Brief on the Merits
10/03/1961Document received (See Remarks)
10/03/1961Document received (See Remarks)
10/03/1961Document received (See Remarks)
09/05/1961Response to Petition
08/15/1961Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
08/15/1961Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Rory Flynn, et al.Respondent
Genell, Inc.Petitioner
Lieck and LieckAmicus Curiae
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information