judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-8614
A-8614
08/22/1961
Application for Writ of Error
EDNA MAE BLAYLOCK
CLARA RISER, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
01/24/1962Brief on the MeritsRespondent
08/29/1961Response to PetitionPetitioner
08/22/1961Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/21/1962Opinion issued
01/24/1962Brief on the Merits
01/03/1962Document received (See Remarks)
08/29/1961Response to Petition
08/22/1961Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
08/22/1961Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Clara Riser, et al.Respondent
Edna Mae BlaylockPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information