Case: 19-0864
19-0864
09/24/2019
Petition for Review originally filed as 53.7(f)
RICHARD CULOTTA AND SHANNON CULOTTA
DOUBLETREE HOTELS LLC, DOUBLETREE MANAGEMENT LLC, HILTON INNS LLC, HILTON RESORTS CORPORATION, HILTON PROPERTIES, LTD. AND GAL-TEX HOTEL CORPORATION
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
11/26/2019 | Petition for Review | Petitioner | Petition for Review filed on behalf of Richard Culotta and Shannon Culotta. |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
04/16/2020 | Notice sent to Court of Appeals | |
| |||||
03/13/2020 | Petition for Review disposed | Denied | |
| ||||
12/03/2019 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |||||
12/02/2019 | Response Waiver filed | Response Waiver filed on behalf of Doubletree Hotels, LLC, et al. | ||||||
11/26/2019 | Petition for Review | Petition for Review filed on behalf of Richard Culotta and Shannon Culotta. |
| |||||
10/25/2019 | Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposed | Filing granted | Second Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review is granted. Petition for Review is due November 27, 2019. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. |
| ||||
10/25/2019 | Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed | Unopposed Second Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Richard and Shannon Culotta. |
| |||||
09/24/2019 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposed | Filing granted | Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review has been granted. Petition for Review is due on October 28, 2019. |
| ||||
09/24/2019 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed | Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Richard and Shannon Culotta. |
| |||||
09/24/2019 | Supplement to Clerk's/Reporter's Record | | | |||||
09/24/2019 | Supplement to Clerk's/Reporter's Record | | | |||||
09/24/2019 | Supplement to Clerk's/Reporter's Record | | | |||||
09/24/2019 | Supplement to Clerk's/Reporter's Record | | | |||||
09/24/2019 | Clerk's Record | | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
04/16/2020 | Case Stored | Case stored. | e-stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Doubletree Hotels LLC | Respondent | Ms. Amie Pina Fordan Mr. Michael D. Tanner |
Hilton Properties, Ltd. | Respondent | Ms. Amie Pina Fordan Mr. Michael D. Tanner |
Hilton Resorts Corporation | Respondent | Ms. Amie Pina Fordan Mr. Michael D. Tanner |
Gal-Tex Hotel Corporation | Respondent | Mr. Michael D. Tanner Ms. Amie Pina Fordan |
Doubletree Management LLC | Respondent | Ms. Amie Pina Fordan Mr. Michael D. Tanner |
Hilton Inns LLC | Respondent | Mr. Michael D. Tanner Ms. Amie Pina Fordan |
Culotta , Richard | Petitioner | Mr. Reginald E. McKamie Sr. Ms. Kristen Vander-Plas |
Hilton Worldwide, Inc. | Respondent | Ms. Amie Pina Fordan Mr. Michael D. Tanner |
Culotta, Shannon | Petitioner | Ms. Kristen Vander-Plas |
Court of Appeals Information:
01-18-00267-CV
Affirmed
___ SW3d ___, 06-25-19
1st Court of Appeals
Honorable Sarah Beth Landau
Trial Court Information
295th District Court
Harris
Honorable Caroline E. Baker
2015-73364