judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SMITH'S FOOD & DRUG VS. WISEMAN

Case Information: 38175
Short Caption:SMITH'S FOOD & DRUG VS. WISEMANCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A426945Classification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:07/27/2001 / Marks, DanielSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/16/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from J. Michael McGroarty, Chartered--check no. 18219.
07/16/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-12084
07/26/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-12661
07/27/2001Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Daniel Marks. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
11/21/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 01-19585
11/21/2001Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 01-19586
12/12/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b) SNP/CLK 01-20814
12/12/2001Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.