judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

PAUL J. FLETCHER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CO-1065
Short Caption:PAUL J. FLETCHER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Other Criminal
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:FEL77609-74Filed Date:08/24/2010

Opening Event Date:08/24/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:09/09/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/22/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantPaul J. Fletcher YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
08/24/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
09/03/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on August 24, 2010, and it appearing that appellant was found eligible for cost-waived status in the trial court, and it further appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index and record copies in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). FOR THE COURT, JULIO A. CASTILLO, CLERK (By: JAC)
09/09/2010RECORD INDEX
09/09/2010RECORD COPIES
09/09/2010RECORD COMPLETED
09/14/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JJ) For the Court, Julio A. Castillo, Clerk.
10/07/2010APPELLANT'S BRIEF
10/07/2010APPENDIX to Appellant's Brief
11/12/2010APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
11/15/2010TMC - motion for summary affirmance - appellant's brief/appdx
01/31/2011On consideration of appellee's motion for summary affirmance, appellant's brief and the record on appeal, it is O that appellee's motion for summary affirmance is granted. (SE ORDER) FO that teh order on appeal is hereby affirmed. (RZBRKG)
01/31/2011AFFIRMED
02/22/2011MANDATE ISSUED