judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-8640
A-8640
09/19/1961
Application for Writ of Error
DEPARTMENT OF MENTAL HYGIENE
BANK OF THE SOUTHWEST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/08/1962Motion for RehearingPetitioner
10/03/1961Response to PetitionRespondent
09/19/1961Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/22/1962Letter Filed
03/08/1962Motion for RehearingOverruled
02/21/1962Opinion issued
11/08/1961Document received (See Remarks)
10/03/1961Response to Petition
09/19/1961Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
09/19/1961Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Bank of the Southwest National Association, et al.Respondent
Department of Mental HygienePetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information