Case: 10-19-00006-CV
10-19-00006-CV
01/07/2019
Miscellaneous/other civil
Terry Aslin
Coryell County, Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
03/04/2020 | Letter brief filed | Appellant |
| ||
04/16/2019 | Reply brief filed | Appellee |
| ||
04/08/2019 | Reply brief filed | Appellant |
| ||
03/26/2019 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | Appellee |
| ||
02/21/2019 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellant |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
03/04/2020 | Letter brief filed |
| |||||
04/23/2019 | Motion for leave disposed | Grant motion | | ||||
04/16/2019 | Reply brief filed |
| |||||
04/16/2019 | Motion for leave filed |
| |||||
04/08/2019 | Reply brief filed |
| |||||
03/26/2019 | Case ready to be set | | |||||
03/26/2019 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested |
| |||||
02/21/2019 | Brief filed - oral argument requested |
| |||||
01/22/2019 | Email received |
| |||||
01/14/2019 | Clerks record filed | | |||||
01/08/2019 | Docketing statement filed | ||||||
01/07/2019 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
| |||||
12/10/2018 | Judgment signed by trial court judge |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
03/26/2019 | At Issue | At issue |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Aslin, Terry | Appellant | R. John Cullar |
Coryell County, Texas | Appellee | Eric Johnston |
Trial Court Information
52nd District Court
Coryell
Honorable James Lee Carroll
DC-17-47034
Jeannye L. Skinner