Case: 08-18-00018-CV
08-18-00018-CV
02/08/2018
Miscellaneous/other civil
Rosa Maria Arzate
Matthew Manuel Andujo and Juan Miguel Torres
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
05/25/2018 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | Appellant |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
08/01/2019 | Mandate issued |
| |||||||||
04/30/2019 | Opinion issued | Reversed and Remanded |
| ||||||||
11/29/2018 | Submitted | | |||||||||
09/07/2018 | Set for submission on briefs |
| |||||||||
07/07/2018 | Case ready to be set | | |||||||||
06/27/2018 | Notice of late brief |
| |||||||||
05/25/2018 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested |
| |||||||||
05/14/2018 | Order entered |
| |||||||||
05/14/2018 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||||||
05/14/2018 | Fee paid | | |||||||||
05/14/2018 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||||||
04/30/2018 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||||||
04/30/2018 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||||||
04/30/2018 | Fee paid | | |||||||||
04/09/2018 | Fee paid | | |||||||||
04/09/2018 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||||||
04/09/2018 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||||||
03/08/2018 | Clerks record filed |
| |||||||||
03/05/2018 | Reporters record filed |
| |||||||||
02/20/2018 | Fee paid | | |||||||||
02/08/2018 | Court fee due |
| |||||||||
02/08/2018 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
08/01/2019 | Retention | Date civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Azarte, Rosa Maria | Appellant | Hon. Jeffrey B. Pownell |
Torres, Juan Miguel | Appellee | Juan Miguel Torres |
Andujo, Matthew Manuel | Appellee | Matthew Manuel Andujo |
Trial Court Information
243rd District Court
El Paso
Honorable Selena Solis
2017DCV0567
Andrea Logue