judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JOSE M. ROMERO V. DEUTSCHE BANK TRUST COMPANY

Case Information: 10-CV-1044
Short Caption:JOSE M. ROMERO V. DEUTSCHE BANK TRUST COMPANYClassification:Appeals - Civil - Landlord And Tenant
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:LTB40256-09Filed Date:08/11/2010

Opening Event Date:08/11/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:12/14/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/04/2011
Argued/Submitted:12/06/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/30/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJose M. Romero NPro SeN
AppelleeDeutsche Bank National Trust CompanyN
Edward CordoneNY
Steven A. PozefskyYY
Eric A. FrechtelNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
08/11/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
09/15/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on August 11, 2010, it is ORDERED that appellant shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, complete and file with this court a single copy of the attached statement regarding transcript. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. If partial transcripts are being ordered, appellant must file a statement of issues to be raised on appeal with this court within 10 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 10 (b)(3)(A). It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC) elp
10/04/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT-NEEDED/RT-ORDERED for 1/26/10, 2/16/10, 3/9/10, 3/16/10, & 8/3/10) (elp)
12/10/2010 It appearing that appellant has been notified by the Court Reporting Division of the Superior Court that the transcripts requested for this appeal have been prepared and are ready for transmittal to this court, it is ORDERED that appellant shall within 10 calendar days from the date of this order make the necessary arrangements to have the transcripts transmitted to this court. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant shall, within 10 calendar days from the date of this order, file a notice showing that appellant has paid for the transcript and attach a copy of the receipt to the notice. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice. See D.C. App. R. 13. (JAC) elp
12/14/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1 (11-pgs/tape 2/16/10 proc.)
12/14/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#2 (4-pgs/tape 3/16/10 proc.)
12/14/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#3 (17-pgs/tape 8/3/10 proc)w/cd
12/14/2010RECORD COMPLETED
12/20/2010 On consideration of this court's order of December 10, 2010, directing appellant to make the necessary arrangement to have the transcript transmitted and to file notice showing that appellant has paid for the transcript within 10 calendar days from the date of the order, and it appearing the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
12/21/2010RECORD INDEX
02/07/2011 On consideration of this court's order of December 20, 2010, directing appellant to file the brief and the appendix within 40 days and it appearing that the brief and the appendix have not been filed, it is ORDERED that the brief of appellant and the appendix shall be submitted within 20 days from the date of this order, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the documents or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice. See D.C. App. R. 13. (JAC) elp
03/04/2011 On consideration of this court's order of February 7, 2011, directing appellant to submit the brief and the appendix, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time, and it appearing that appellant has failed to comply with the order, it is ORDERED that this appeal is hereby dismissed. See D.C. App. R. 13. (ETW) elp
03/04/2011DISMISSED
03/09/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO REINSTATE APPEAL
03/09/2011RECEIVED- aplt's brief
03/09/2011RECEIVED- motion for leave to file brief late
03/09/2011RECEIVED- aplt's appendix
04/04/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion to reinstate this appeal, to which no opposition has been filed, the lodged motion of appellant for leave to file the lodged brief and appendix, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion to reinstate is granted and this appeal is hereby reinstated. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall file the appellant's lodged motion for leave to file the brief and appendix. It is (MORE)
04/04/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF
04/04/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's motion for leave is granted and the Clerk shall file the lodged brief of appellant and the appendix. It is (MORE)
04/04/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
04/04/2011APPENDIX - (ATTACHED TO APPENDIX)
04/04/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that the brief of appellee shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this order. (ETW) elp
05/04/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
05/04/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
05/04/2011APPEARANCE - of Steven A. Pozefsky & Erick A. Frechel on behalf of aple
05/13/2011FiledFinal Screening-Summary
06/09/2011AMICUS CURIAE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF
06/09/2011RECEIVED - Amicus Curia brief
06/13/2011TMC - motion to file (LODGED) amicus brief
06/27/2011 ORDERED that the motion of KILMURRY PROPERTIES, LLC to file an amicus brief IS DENIED. (GL*RDTE) *JRD would have permitted the filing of the lodged brief...
11/03/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
12/06/2011FiledSubmitted To Glickman,Oberly,Pryor
01/05/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Glickman and Oberly, Associate Judges, and Pryor, Senior Judge.)
01/30/2012FiledMandate