judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DOYLE VS. MORRIS

Case Information: 38153
Short Caption:DOYLE VS. MORRISCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV9904554Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:07/19/2001 / Cashill, Wm.SP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/10/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Galloway & Jensen--check no. 10185.
07/10/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-11576
07/19/2001Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: William Patterson Cashill. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
07/26/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. 01-12683
09/04/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date, appellant has failed to file the docketing statement. Appellant shall, within 10 days of the date of this order, file and serve the docketing statement. Failure to file a complete and accurate docketing statement in a timely manner may result in the imposition of sanctions. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-14920
09/12/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-15434
09/14/2001Notice/Outgoing Letter. William Patterson Cashill.
11/26/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: January 3, 2002. 01-19727
02/13/2002Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 02-02882
02/13/2002Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 02-02883
02/13/2002Settlement AgreementFiled Settlement Agreement. 02-02884
02/27/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). SNP/CLK 02-03643
02/27/2002Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.