judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY, as Subrogee v. KYLE A KUNZ and PAUL DUFKA

Case Heading (S-07-0177)
Case Number:S-07-0177Case Docketed On:08/07/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Eighth Judicial District Goshen CountyCase Type:Original Proceeding - Certified Question - State District Court
Short Title:STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY, as Subrogee v. KYLE A KUNZ and PAUL DUFKA
Full Title:STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY, as Subrogee, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. KYLE A KUNZ and PAUL DUFKA, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantState Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance CompanyBillie Ruth Edwards
AppelleeKyle A. Kunz Pro Se
AppelleePaul Dufka Pro Se

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Jurisdiction
Opinion Number:2008 WY 71
Citation:186 P.3d 378

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
08/07/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
08/07/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
08/07/2007Rulings-Other Courts/Agencies - Order certifying question Rule 11Rulings-Other Courts/AgenciesOrder certifying question Rule 11Final
08/21/2007Order - Certified Question - Accepting questions/briefingOrderCertified Question - Accepting questions/briefingFinal
10/04/2007Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
11/26/2007Brief - Failure to file - appelleesBriefFailure to file - appelleeFinal
11/29/2007Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
12/13/2007Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
06/23/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order answering certified question, Justice Burke writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
07/09/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal