Case: 10-20-00285-CV
10-20-00285-CV
10/26/2020
Miscellaneous/other civil
Pharus Funding, LLC, as Assignee of LHR, Inc.
Jerry Solley and Lola M. Solley
No
6th Court of Appeals
12/09/2020
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
12/09/2020 | Case stored | | |||||
12/09/2020 | Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals | Grant motion |
| ||||
11/24/2020 | Reporters record filed |
| |||||
11/16/2020 | Docketing statement filed | ||||||
11/13/2020 | Clerks record filed |
| |||||
11/04/2020 | Fee paid |
| |||||
10/26/2020 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
| |||||
09/23/2020 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
12/09/2020 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Solley, Lola M. | Appellee | Lola M. Solley |
Solley, Jerry | Appellee | Jerry Solley |
Pharus Funding, LLC as Assignee of LHR, Inc. | Appellant | Jody D. Jenkins |
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No 1
Johnson
Honorable Robert B. Mayfield
C200800653
Janet McConathy