judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-5736
B-5736
01/07/1975
Application for Writ of Error
MUSE, CURRIE AND KOHEN
MILLARD L. DRAKE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/16/1976Motion for RehearingPetitioner
02/13/1976Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
02/12/1976Reply to ResponsePetitioner
02/05/1976Response to Brief filedPetitioner
01/26/1976Response to PetitionRespondent
01/07/1976Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/26/1976Response to Motion filed
04/16/1976Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/31/1976Opinion issued
02/13/1976Supplemental Brief filed
02/12/1976Reply to Response
02/05/1976Response to Brief filed
01/26/1976Response to Petition
01/23/1976Letter Filed
01/22/1976Statement of Jurisidiction
01/07/1976Application for Writ of Error - Filed
01/07/1975Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Millard L. DrakeRespondent
Muse, Currie and KohenPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information