judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-5605
B-5605
01/07/1975
Application for Writ of Error
BETTY J. VICKREY
AMERICAN YOUTH CAMPS, INC., ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
01/20/1976Motion for RehearingRespondent
11/03/1975Response to PetitionRespondent
10/22/1975Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
01/20/1976Motion for RehearingOverruled
01/07/1976Opinion issued
11/03/1975Response to Petition
10/22/1975Application for Writ of Error - Filed
10/22/1975Document received (See Remarks)
01/07/1975Document received (See Remarks)
01/07/1975Document received (See Remarks)
01/07/1975Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Betty J. VickreyPetitioner
American Youth Camps, Inc., et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information