judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-5034
B-5034
01/15/1975
Application for Writ of Error
FELIX G. COOK, SR., ET AL.
TEXOMA PIPELINE COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/28/1975Motion for RehearingPetitioner
02/17/1975Brief in Support of PetitionRespondent
01/15/1975Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/28/1975Motion for RehearingOverruled
02/28/1975Response to Motion filed
02/17/1975Brief in Support of Petition
02/17/1975Motion to dismissOverruled
01/29/1975Motion for Extension of Time to File ResponseFiling granted
01/15/1975Application for Writ of Error - Filed
01/15/1975Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texoma Pipeline CompanyRespondent
Felix G. Cook, Sr., et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information