judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-5658
B-5658
01/13/1975
Application for Writ of Error
STATE OF TEXAS
MONEX INTERNATIONAL, LTD., DBA PACIFIC COAST COIN EXCHANGE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/03/1976Supplement to Motion for RehearingPetitioner
01/26/1976Supplement to Motion for RehearingPetitioner
12/31/1975Motion for RehearingPetitioner
12/04/1975Supplement to ResponseRespondent
11/21/1975Response to PetitionRespondent
11/20/1975Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/03/1976Supplement to Motion for Rehearing
01/26/1976Supplement to Motion for Rehearing
12/31/1975Motion for RehearingOverruled
12/04/1975Supplement to Response
11/21/1975Response to Petition
11/20/1975Application for Writ of Error - FiledRefused
11/20/1975Document received (See Remarks)
01/13/1975Response to Motion filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
State of TexasPetitioner
Monex International, Ltd., dba Pacific Coast Coin ExchangeRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information