Case: 18-0144
18-0144
02/20/2018
Petition for Review under Tex. R. App. P. 53.1
SWIG PARTNERS LP, SWIG PARTNERS GP, LLC, WOO YOUNG CHUNG, KUN YOUNG KIM, KAY KAIM, KYU YOUNG KIM, STEVEN LEE, HUN KYU LEE, EDWIN PAK, HYUK KEUN KWUN, SHI CHUI KUM, WOON CHUL CHUNG, NAM SUN PAEK, YOO SANG CHO, HWAN HURH, HAK SON AHN, HAROLD K. SHIN, HYO WON BANG, EDWARD KIM, SUN KYUM CHA A/K/A STEPHEN CHA, KWANG H. KIM, JANG Y. LEE, JIM HEE CHA, SUNG CHOOI LEE, JAMES LEE, JIN K. CHING, KWANG JAE LEE, MARY CHU DIERLAM, AND CHONG WON KIM
BRANCH BANKING AND TRUST COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
06/29/2018 | Motion for Rehearing | Rehearing filed in Petition for Review | Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of SWIG Partners LP, et al. |
| ||||
05/21/2018 | Reply to Response | Petitioner | Reply to the Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of SWIG Partners LP, et al. | |||||
05/07/2018 | Response to Petition | Respondent | Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Branch Banking and Trust Company. | |||||
02/20/2018 | Petition for Review | Petitioner | Petition for Review filed on behalf of SWIG Partners GP, LLC, et al. |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
08/29/2018 | Case Stored | e-stored | | |||||
08/03/2018 | Notice sent to Court of Appeals | |
| |||||
08/03/2018 | Motion for Rehearing - Disposed | Denied | |
| ||||
07/03/2018 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |||||
06/29/2018 | Motion for Rehearing | Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of SWIG Partners LP, et al. |
| |||||
06/15/2018 | Petition for Review disposed | Denied | |
| ||||
05/21/2018 | Reply to Response | Reply to the Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of SWIG Partners LP, et al. | ||||||
05/07/2018 | Response to Petition | Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Branch Banking and Trust Company. | ||||||
04/06/2018 | Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response | Requested response to petition for review due no later than May 7, 2018. |
| |||||
02/27/2018 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |||||
02/21/2018 | Adoption by another party of brief already filed | Joinder in Petition for Review filed on behalf of Woo Young Chung, et al. | ||||||
02/21/2018 | Response Waiver filed | Response Waiver filed on behalf of Branch Banking & Trust Company. | ||||||
02/20/2018 | Petition for Review | Petition for Review filed on behalf of SWIG Partners GP, LLC, et al. |
| |||||
02/20/2018 | Supplement to Clerk's/Reporter's Record | | | |||||
02/20/2018 | Clerk's Record | | | |||||
02/20/2018 | Court reporter/recorder's record | | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
08/29/2018 | Case Stored | Case stored. | e-stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Ching, Jin K. | Petitioner | Mr. Jeffrey Sandberg Ms. Joyce Williams Lindauer |
Lee, Jang Y. | Petitioner | Mr. Jeffrey Sandberg Ms. Joyce Williams Lindauer |
Kim, Kwang H. | Petitioner | Mr. Jeffrey Sandberg Ms. Joyce Williams Lindauer |
SWIG Partners GP, LLC | Petitioner | Ms. Joyce Williams Lindauer Mr. Jeffrey Sandberg |
Kim, Kyu Young | Petitioner | Mr. Jeffrey Sandberg Ms. Joyce Williams Lindauer |
SWIG Partners LP | Petitioner | Ms. Joyce Williams Lindauer Mr. Jeffrey Sandberg |
Lee, Hun Kyu | Petitioner | Mr. Jeffrey Sandberg Ms. Joyce Williams Lindauer |
Bang, Hyo Won | Petitioner | Mr. Jeffrey Sandberg Ms. Joyce Williams Lindauer |
Branch Banking and Trust Company | Respondent | Mr. Thomas M. Whelan Mr. James G. Rea |
Cha, Sun Kyum | Petitioner | Ms. Joyce Williams Lindauer Mr. Jeffrey Sandberg |
Lee, Steven | Petitioner | Ms. Joyce Williams Lindauer Mr. Jeffrey Sandberg |
Chung, Woon Chul | Petitioner | Ms. Joyce Williams Lindauer Mr. Jeffrey Sandberg |
Ahn, Hak Son | Petitioner | Ms. Joyce Williams Lindauer Mr. Jeffrey Sandberg |
Kim, Chong Won | Petitioner | Ms. Joyce Williams Lindauer Mr. Jeffrey Sandberg |
Kim, Edward | Petitioner | Ms. Joyce Williams Lindauer Mr. Jeffrey Sandberg |
Jim Hee Cha, et al. | Petitioner | Ms. Joyce Williams Lindauer |
Cho, Yoo Sang | Petitioner | Mr. Jeffrey Sandberg Ms. Joyce Williams Lindauer |
Court of Appeals Information:
05-15-00878-CV
Aff/Pt and Rev & Rem/Pt
___ SW3d ___, 12-13-17
5th Court of Appeals
Honorable Molly Meredith Francis
Trial Court Information
134th District Court
Dallas
Honorable Dale B. Tillery
DC-14-03427