judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 10th Court Of Appeals

Case: 10-94-00028-CR
10-94-00028-CR
02/23/1994
Assault & battery
Ronald Plyant
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/27/1994Case stored
12/27/1994Mandate issued by this Court
11/09/1994Opinion issuedAffirmed
08/05/1994Submission
07/26/1994Case ready to be set
07/26/1994No Description Available.
06/28/1994No Description Available.
04/27/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/26/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed
03/30/1994No Description Available.
02/23/1994No Description Available.
02/23/1994Notice of Appeal filed
02/23/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
09/07/1974Submitted
09/07/1974Submission
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/27/2019Case StoredDestroy case in 25 years.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas, The State OfCriminal - State of TexasDenna J. Mcconnell
Bill R. Turner
Plyant, RonaldAppellantMichael F. O`connor
Trial Court Information
361st District Court
Brazos
Honorable Carolyn L. Ruffino
22,291-361
20yrs./$10000 fine