Case: 02-93-00001-CR
02-93-00001-CR
01/05/1993
Assault or Attempted Murder
Collins, Joshua Holden
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
08/20/1993 | Mandate Issued | | |
07/06/1993 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
05/20/1993 | Submitted | | |
05/20/1993 | Submission | | |
04/29/1993 | Submission | | |
04/19/1993 | Brief Filed | | |
04/19/1993 | Case ready to be set | | |
04/01/1993 | Brief Filed | | |
03/01/1993 | Criminal record or relator's record and/or exhibits | | |
03/01/1993 | No Description Available. | | |
03/01/1993 | Request for Extension of Recorder's Record Disposd | Motion or Writ Granted | |
01/22/1993 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
01/12/1993 | Extension to File Notice of Appeal Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
01/05/1993 | Extension to File Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
01/05/1993 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
08/20/1993 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Unknown User | Criminal - State of Texas | |
Collins, Joshua Holden | Criminal - Appellant |
Trial Court Information
355th District Court
Hood
Honorable David C. White
6363
20 yrs. IDTDCJ