judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals

Case: 14-94-00154-CV
14-94-00154-CV
02/22/1994
Mandamus/prohibition
Steelman, Beatrice, and Steelman, John V.
Brister, Scott A., Judge of 234th District Court, Et Al
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/31/2011Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
02/25/1994Case stored
02/24/1994Opinion issuedDENIED
02/24/1994Opinion issuedDENIED
02/23/1994Submitted
02/23/1994Submission
02/23/1994Submitted
02/22/1994Extend time to file transcript FILED-ANT,APE
02/22/1994Mtn.Lv.file writ of mandamus DISPOSED-APP,REL,RESDENIED
02/22/1994Mtn.Lv.file writ of mandamus FILED-APP,REL,RES
02/22/1994Petition for Writ of mandamus RECEIVED - REL
02/22/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/25/1994Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationRespondentDavid Prichard
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationRespondentHon. John Abbey
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationRespondentJudge, 234th District Court
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationRespondentGail N. Friend
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationRelatorHon. W. Jiles Roberts
Trial Court Information
234th District Court
Harris
92-42773