Case Information: 38170 | |||
Short Caption: | LYTLE (CORY) VS. STATE) | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Lincoln Co. - Seventh Judicial District - 21122000LCR | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
07/16/2001 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
07/16/2001 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 01-12077 | |
08/28/2001 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 01-14527 | |
08/28/2001 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 01-14528 | |
09/12/2001 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 01-15439 | |
09/12/2001 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Response. | 01-15441 | |
10/10/2001 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP02-MS/RR/NB | 01-17080 | |
11/06/2001 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 01-17315 | |
11/06/2001 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
11/14/2001 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 8, 2001. | 01-17315 |