Case Heading (S-07-0188) | |||||
Case Number: | S-07-0188 | Case Docketed On: | 08/16/2007 | ||
Status: | Closed | ||||
Original Court: | First Judicial District Laramie County | Case Type: | Direct Appeal - Civil - Code of Civil Procedure (Title 1) | ||
Short Title: | KEITH T. VOGT v. MBNA AMERICA BANK | ||||
Full Title: | KEITH T. VOGT, Appellant (Defendant), v. MBNA AMERICA BANK, Appellee (Plaintiff). |
- Party Information |
Role | Party Name | Attorney(s) |
Appellant | Keith T. Vogt | Pro Se |
Appellee | MBNA America Bank | Rocklon L. Edmonds |
- Case Decision Information | |
Issues: | Arbitration, Jurisdiction |
Opinion Number: | 2008 WY 26 |
Citation: | 178 P.3d 405 (Wyo. 2008) |
Docketing Filter View |
Display: |
Docket Information | |||||
Filing Date | Document Description | Docket Entry Type | Docket Entry Subtype | Status | |
08/16/2007 | Event - Docketed and indexed | Event | Docketed and indexed | Final | |
08/16/2007 | Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from DC but no NOA received. Contacted district court clerk for pleadings. | Notice-Incoming | Record completion notice from DC but no NOA received | Final | |
08/16/2007 | Fees - Docket fee received | Fees | Docket fee received | Final | |
08/16/2007 | Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter | Notice-Outgoing | Docketing letter | Final | |
09/28/2007 | Brief - Appellant | Brief | Appellant | Final | |
11/13/2007 | Brief - Appellee | Brief | Appellee | Final | |
11/16/2007 | Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendation | Notice-Internal | Brief only recommendation | Final | |
12/03/2007 | Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal | Notice-Outgoing | Request for transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
12/04/2007 | Order - Assigning to expedited docket | Order | Assigning to brief only docket | Final | |
12/12/2007 | Record - Transmitted record on appeal, one volume, original papers. | Record | Transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
03/06/2008 | Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Kite writing for the court. | Opinion | Opinion and journal order | Final | |
03/24/2008 | Notice-Outgoing - Mandate | Notice-Outgoing | Mandate | Final | |
03/24/2008 | Record - Record returned to district court | Record | Record returned to district court | Final | |
03/24/2008 | Notice-Outgoing - Record return letter | Notice-Outgoing | Record return letter | Final | |
03/24/2008 | Event - Case closed | Event | Case closed | Final | |
03/26/2008 | Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 3/25/08 by Rosemary Montez. | Service | Certified mail signature return card | Final |