judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CARISIA L. DYSON V. DC DEP'T OF EMPLOYMENT SERVS.

Case Information: 10-AA-1061
Short Caption:CARISIA L. DYSON V. DC DEP'T OF EMPLOYMENT SERVS.Classification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Worker's Compensation
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CRB112-10Filed Date:08/26/2010

Opening Event Date:08/26/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:09/17/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/28/2010
Argued/Submitted:05/04/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/13/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
Intervenor-RespondentChildren's National Medical CenterN
Alan D. Sundburg YN
Intervenor-RespondentAvizent Risk N
Alan D. Sundburg YN
PetitionerCarisia L. Dyson N
Michael J. KitzmanYY
RespondentD.C. Department of Employment Services - Worker's Comp.N
Todd S. KimNY
David A. Hyden NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
08/26/2010PETITION FOR REVIEW
08/26/2010FILING FEE $100.00.
08/26/2010CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD, Todd Kim, Esq. & Gregory Lamb, Esq.
09/17/2010RECORD ON APPEAL w/2/24/10 hearing attached
09/17/2010RECORD COMPLETED
09/22/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that petitioner's brief and the appendix shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and respondent's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 30, 31. (JAC)
09/23/2010NOTICE OF INTENT TO INTERVENE of Children's National Medical Center & Avizent Risk
11/01/2010PETITIONER'S BRIEF
11/01/2010APPENDIX
12/06/2010INTERVENOR'S BRIEF
12/06/2010APPENDIX - supplemental
12/06/2010RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 12/20/10
12/20/2010RECEIVED Respondent's Statement in Lieu of Brief (mexb still pend).
12/28/2010ORDER GRANT RESP MOTION TO EXT TIME TO FILE BRIEF and respondent's lodged statement in lieu of brief is filed. It is F/O that this matter shall be scheduled before a merits division of this court as soon as the calendar permits. (JAC)
12/28/2010STATEMENT (DOES)
12/28/2010BRIEFS COMPLETED
02/17/2011FINAL SCREENING - SUMMARY CALENDAR I
04/05/2011CALENDAR NOTICE SENT
04/21/2011LETTER FROM COUNSEL REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENT (aplt) Denied
05/02/2011On consideration of petitioner's request to place this matter on the Regular Calendadr for oral argument, it is ORDERED that the request is denied and this matter shall be submitted for decision on May 4, 2011, without oral argument by either party, on the record and briefs alone. (B-R,RD,SC)
05/04/2011FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
05/04/2011SUBMITTED to Judges Reid, Blackburne-Rigsby, Schwelb
09/15/2011FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Blackburne-Rigsby, Reid and Schwelb)
10/13/2011FiledMandate